Financial history HOWE CROFT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1161915
Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £16.00k £27.55k £28.05k £25.40k £27.50k
Total expenditure £18.00k £19.16k £22.82k £33.70k £29.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £17.60k N/A