Trustees LOUGHBOROUGH SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1160201

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIVIENNE JEANETTE MCINTOSH | Chair | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eileen McDermott | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Allan Mr | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Keith Wheeldon | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN de-VILLE | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Anne Barrows | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELAINE LORIMER | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE BARRETT | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.