Financial history KINGDOM POWER MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (KPMI)

Charity number: 1161295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £57.32k £33.96k £45.08k £53.05k £63.83k
Total expenditure £59.43k £39.26k £52.47k £51.91k £60.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.55k £5.30k N/A £3.71k N/A