Accounts and annual returns IMAMIA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF PETERBOROUGH

Charity Number: 1163467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 May 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 May 2024 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 April 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 27 April 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 June 2021 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 23 June 2021 84 days late Download Open in new window