Trustees FRAMTASTICS GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 1161535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Greenhouse Chair 08 December 2021
None on record
RACHEL PERRY Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Charlotte Loades Trustee 18 December 2024
None on record
Toni-Marrie Smith Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record
Kate Phillips Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Carol Sutherland Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record