Financial history SPRING MOUNT CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1163628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £217.62k £170.46k £203.75k £287.83k £470.19k
Total expenditure £191.89k £183.67k £214.39k £269.39k £409.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £40.00k £57.60k £254.40k