Accounts and annual returns THE AVENUES BICYCLE PROJECT

Charity number: 1163510
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 March 2017 On Time