Governing document THE RICHMONDSHIRE MUSEUM SOCIETY
Charity number: 505917
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUL 1978 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 1986 AS AMENDED ON 26 AUG 2008 AS AMENDED ON 19 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF A MUSEUM TO PRESERVE AND DISPLAY ARTICLES OF LITERARY ARTISTIC SCIENTIFIC CULTURAL OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DISTRICT OF RICHMONDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.