Financial history THE SIVA TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1166332
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £102.52k £69.12k £100.23k £90.11k £148.34k
Total expenditure £99.55k £66.83k £79.18k £86.17k £113.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A