Accounts and annual returns FAMILY CHURCH GATESHEAD

Charity number: 1161507
Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 22 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 22 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 30 August 2023 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 30 August 2023 183 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 30 August 2023 548 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 30 August 2023 548 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 July 2021 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 28 July 2021 150 days late Download Open in new window