Accounts and annual returns DARTFORD AREA SCHOOLS CONSORTIUM

Charity Number: 1163635
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 February 2020 On Time