Accounts and annual returns FAMILY HELP (DARLINGTON)

Charity number: 506051
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 05 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 05 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 12 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 12 October 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 25 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 25 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 October 2010 On Time