Accounts and annual returns LARCHFIELD TANZANIA HOMES

Charity Number: 1163227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 03 January 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required