Financial history KILMARNOCK ROAD CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FAMILY RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1162287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £265.31k £159.92k £141.94k £87.69k £122.56k
Total expenditure £238.51k £135.41k £143.60k £122.65k £141.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.93k £34.58k £12.20k £2.73k £3.60k