Accounts and annual returns FOREST UNITED (1973) YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1161923
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 January 2025 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required