Accounts and annual returns CITY YOGA PROJECT

Charity number: 1164271
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2022 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 April 2022 431 days late