Accounts and annual returns EAGLE MOUNTAIN

Charity number: 1162545
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 March 2020 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 March 2020 55 days late
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2018 On Time