Financial history THE MERTHYR TYDFIL TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION FOR THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity Number: 506220
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £130 £203 £366 £81 £366
Total expenditure £849 £695 £766 £647 £728
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A