Financial history PAPPLEWICK RDA

Charity number: 1161982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.66k £26.06k £3.57k £1.66k £2.21k
Total expenditure £32.29k £25.36k £13.53k £6.49k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.50k N/A N/A N/A