Accounts and annual returns WALLSEND SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1162248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 April 2023 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required