Accounts and annual returns FARNDON AFTER SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1162791
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2022 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 March 2022 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 March 2022 617 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted