Financial history SPELTHORNE DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1165346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £7.68k £6.96k £13.82k £11.45k £35.51k
Total expenditure £5.02k £14.62k £13.45k £17.51k £24.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £200 N/A N/A N/A