Accounts and annual returns SOUTH DERBYSHIRE MINERS CHARITY

Charity number: 506522
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 02 September 2008 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 23 October 2007 722 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 23 October 2007 722 days late