Financial history GURSEVA

Charity number: 1166849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.82k £31.14k £25.46k £19.23k £42.44k
Total expenditure £2.37k £30.41k £15.53k £14.59k £15.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.62k N/A N/A £12.07k