Accounts and annual returns HEALTH EXCHANGE UK

Charity number: 1168629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 08 May 2019 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required