Accounts and annual returns EMMANUEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP - ILFORD

Charity number: 1169533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 March 2023 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window