Accounts and annual returns INCUBATION@CHARLES ROE HOUSE CIO

Charity number: 1164275
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 09 April 2025 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 09 April 2025 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 09 April 2025 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 09 April 2025 374 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 07 April 2025 738 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 07 April 2025 738 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 April 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 April 2022 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 April 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 13 April 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window