Trustees SURVIVORS OF ABUSE

Charity number: 1166712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Suzanne Denny-Bowne Trustee 19 May 2025
None on record
Pauline Sharp Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
ANDREW JAMES CRAWFORD Trustee 15 April 2016
None on record
DIANE SEALEY BSC Trustee 14 April 2016
None on record
CHRIS TUCK MAAT ACMA Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record