Accounts and annual returns RHODA MARY PROJECT

Charity number: 1165423
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2022 21 December 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 21 December 2022 21 days late
Annual return 31 January 2021 21 December 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 21 December 2021 21 days late
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 March 2021 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 26 March 2021 116 days late