Financial history COMMUNITY FRIENDS OF MALTON, NORTON AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL

Charity number: 506802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £99.39k £65.01k £99.81k £80.42k £216.66k
Total expenditure £206.99k £82.04k £118.62k £102.21k £115.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A