Financial history CHANGE NIGERIA PROJECT

Charity number: 1165121
Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £14.09k £14.08k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £11.27k £11.27k £1.80k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A