Financial history The Greenwoods Charitable Trust

Charity Number: 1167249
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £102.15k £118.90k £139.10k £35.12k £30.53k
Total expenditure £32.13k £71.20k £96.85k £85.89k £18.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A