Financial history THE NATIONAL DIGNITY COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1165500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.51k £9.29k £8.85k £9.98k £9.96k
Total expenditure £10.47k £11.68k £9.66k £8.79k £11.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A