Accounts and annual returns WOOD FOLD PTFA

Charity number: 1164145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 15 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required