Accounts and annual returns GALLERY CHURCH

Charity number: 1164372
Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 23 September 2023 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 23 September 2023 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 May 2021 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 May 2021 340 days late Download Open in new window