Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BISHOPTHORPE INFANT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1165501
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 13 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
Annual return 13 July 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 13 July 2022 26 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 13 July 2021 20 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required