Financial history PARKSIDE PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1164184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023
Total gross income £19.58k £9.43k £5.55k £15.81k £16.33k
Total expenditure £4.81k £3.36k £1.29k £7.06k £9.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A