Accounts and annual returns RYE COMMUNITY SHOP

Charity number: 1165854
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time