Financial history NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCHES WALES

Charity number: 1165488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.48k £30.83k £33.42k £33.98k £34.11k
Total expenditure £25.26k £35.91k £24.19k £33.94k £26.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A