Financial history ELTHAM SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1164190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.72k £2.56k £7.21k £7.21k £11.16k
Total expenditure £12.27k £7.62k £6.08k £6.08k £7.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A