Accounts and annual returns THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD KINGDOM LIFE TABERNACLE YORK

Charity number: 1169594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required