Financial history MAISIE MOO FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1164941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/04/2020 24/04/2021 24/04/2022 24/04/2023 24/04/2024
Total gross income £5.81k £2.78k £2.71k £8.87k £4.33k
Total expenditure £2.63k £3.35k £1.28k £3.24k £4.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A