Accounts and annual returns GRANGE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1166838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 17 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 November 2023 152 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required