Financial history FRIENDSHIP LINK & ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1165681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.64k £3.19k £3.19k £13.14k £8.46k
Total expenditure £8.44k £1.02k £1.02k £14.95k £9.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A £1.00k