Accounts and annual returns ST LUKE'S PENTECOSTAL CHURCH SOUTH KIRKBY

Charity Number: 507210
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 March 2009 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 05 June 2008 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 05 June 2008 126 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 March 2007 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 09 March 2007 37 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 23 March 2005 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 23 March 2005 51 days late