Financial history THE CLARA C LUCAS BEQUEST

Charity number: 507230
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £659 £656 £496 £557 £542
Total expenditure £120 £120 £120 £120 £180
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A