Financial history ROWAN ROMANIA

Charity number: 1166547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £13.85k £7.29k £7.02k £8.03k £3.09k
Total expenditure £10.71k £9.92k £8.11k £7.31k £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A