Accounts and annual returns HAZIE DAYS

Charity number: 1168475
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days
Annual return 09 July 2023 22 August 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2023 22 August 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 July 2022 13 July 2023 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2022 13 July 2023 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 July 2021 23 March 2023 318 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2021 23 March 2023 318 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window