Financial history SWINDON (DEVIZES ROAD) SPIRITUALIST CENTRE

Charity number: 1164981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £74.04k £7.70k £12.00k £11.00k £12.00k
Total expenditure £47.99k £12.30k £7.00k £6.00k £14.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A