Financial history THE MAYOR OF PETERBOROUGH'S CHARITY FUND

Charity Number: 1165640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £11.00k £1.31k £19.33k £25.16k £34.33k
Total expenditure £3.98k £0 £4.31k £40.52k £12.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A